AL HB335 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Delivered to Governor at 10:11 a.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Delivered to Governor at 10:11 a.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solid waste collection and disposal, contracts for, competitive bid laws revised, Secs. 22-27-5, 41-16-57 am'd.
Title
Solid waste collection and disposal, contracts for, competitive bid laws revised, Secs. 22-27-5, 41-16-57 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. David Faulkner [R] | Rep. Sam Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 992 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1069 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1068 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1067 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 129 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Baker motion to Adopt Roll Call 128 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1069 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1068 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1067 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 129 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Baker motion to Adopt Roll Call 128 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:11 a.m. on April 29, 2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-378. |
2021-04-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-27 | House | Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 992 |
2021-04-27 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-22 | House | Baker motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-22 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1069 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1068 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 129 |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 27 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 16 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |