AL HB334 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Merrill motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Merrill motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supernumerary ad valorem tax officials, cap on compensation increased, Sec. 40-6-3 am'd.
Title
Supernumerary ad valorem tax officials, cap on compensation increased, Sec. 40-6-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - Roberts motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time (Y: 40 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Merrill motion to Table (Y: 29 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - Merrill motion to Table (Y: 29 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Merrill motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-30 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2013-04-02 | House | Roberts motion to Carry Over Until 25th legislative day adopted Roll Call 252 |
2013-04-02 | House | Merrill motion to Table lost Roll Call 251 |
2013-04-02 | House | Roberts motion to Carry Over Until 25th legislative day lost |
2013-04-02 | House | State Government first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading Carried Over to Time Certain |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |