AL HB333 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Justice Information Commission, membership further provided for judges of probate and municipal court judges, Sec. 41-9-592 am'd.
Title
Justice Information Commission, membership further provided for judges of probate and municipal court judges, Sec. 41-9-592 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 681 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 360 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 359 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Almond motion to Adopt Roll Call 358 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 360 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 359 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Almond motion to Adopt Roll Call 358 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 29, 2022. |
2022-03-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-240. |
2022-03-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 681 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-24 | House | McCampbell intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 360 |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 359 |
2022-02-24 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |