AL HB332 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Miles College, police jurisdictional limitations removed, Sec. 16-22-1 am'd.
Title
Miles College, police jurisdictional limitations removed, Sec. 16-22-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Engrossed |
2015-06-04 | House | Engrossed |
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-409. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1463 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1462 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-12 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 690 |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 689 |
2015-05-12 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |