AL HB33 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Calhoun Co., municipalities not located entirely in the county, territory in county not subject to police jurisdiction or planning jurisdiction, exception for City of Oxford, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calhoun Co., municipalities not located entirely in the county, territory in county not subject to police jurisdiction or planning jurisdiction, exception for City of Oxford, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Brown motion Local Application (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-17.
2018-01-30HouseForwarded to Executive Department
2018-01-30HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 4:49 p.m. on January 30, 2018.
2018-01-30HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-01-30SenateSignature Requested
2018-01-30HouseEnrolled
2018-01-30HousePassed Second House
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 164
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-01-16HouseBrown motion Local Application adopted Roll Call 16
2018-01-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 15
2018-01-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback