AL HB33 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Probate court, court costs, payable at discretion of court when pleading filed, security deposits for court costs authorized, Sec. 12-19-43 am'd.
Title
Probate court, court costs, payable at discretion of court when pleading filed, security deposits for court costs authorized, Sec. 12-19-43 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:56 p.m. on May 3, 2017. |
2017-05-03 | House | Engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-293. |
2017-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 843 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Glover motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 90 |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 89 |
2017-02-23 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |