AL HB33 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Assigned Act No. 2016-147.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Assigned Act No. 2016-147.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., sheriff authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System in lieu of supernumerary program, const. amend.
Title
Montgomery Co., sheriff authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System in lieu of supernumerary program, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-147. |
2016-04-21 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 1:56 p.m. on April 21, 2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 762 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 283 |
2016-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |