AL HB33 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Economic Expansion and Trade
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Economic Expansion and Trade
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, presidential preference primary, counties where Mardi Gras recognized as county holiday and having special provisions, expenses reimbursable by state, retroactive effect, Sec. 17-16-2 am'd.
Title
Elections, presidential preference primary, counties where Mardi Gras recognized as county holiday and having special provisions, expenses reimbursable by state, retroactive effect, Sec. 17-16-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. James Buskey [D] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] |
Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Joseph Hubbard [D] | Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Yvonne Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Steve McMillan [R] | Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Economic Expansion and Trade | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Economic Expansion and Trade | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 920 | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 919 | |
2010-04-08 | Government Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations |