AL HB329 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Northport, civil service system, City Administrator/Clerk and City Manager/Clerk included in exempt service, residency requirement for personnel board members, Act 1225, 1969 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Northport, civil service system, City Administrator/Clerk and City Manager/Clerk included in exempt service, residency requirement for personnel board members, Act 1225, 1969 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017. |
2017-04-13 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-166. |
2017-04-13 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 499 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 242 |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation |