AL HB328 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unified Carrier Registration Act of 2005 (UCRA), Department of Public Safety responsible for enforcement of UCRA, collection of fees, disbursement, Secs. 37-3-32, 37-3-32.1 am'd.
Title
Unified Carrier Registration Act of 2005 (UCRA), Department of Public Safety responsible for enforcement of UCRA, collection of fees, disbursement, Secs. 37-3-32, 37-3-32.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund with 1 amendment |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 699 |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 698 |
2014-03-11 | House | Wren Amendment Offered |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 697 |
2014-03-11 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |