AL HB328 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, income tax credit for purchase and installation of irrigation systems, water wells and reservoirs by agricultural entities
Title
Taxation, income tax credit for purchase and installation of irrigation systems, water wells and reservoirs by agricultural entities
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Beech [D] | Rep. Alan Boothe [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Richard Laird [D] |
Rep. Artis McCampbell [D] | Sen. David Sessions [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - Fincher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-391. | |
2012-05-09 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-09 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Fincher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1361 | |
2012-05-08 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1172 | |
2012-05-08 | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1171 | |
2012-05-08 | Singleton Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-08 | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1170 | |
2012-05-08 | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-12 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 731 | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 730 | |
2012-04-12 | Lee Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 729 | |
2012-04-12 | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |