AL HB326 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tier II correctional officers, firefighters and law enforcement officers authorized to retire with full benefits after 25 years of service, Secs. 16-25-14, 16-25-21, 36-27-16, 36-27-24 am'd.
Title
Tier II correctional officers, firefighters and law enforcement officers authorized to retire with full benefits after 25 years of service, Secs. 16-25-14, 16-25-21, 36-27-16, 36-27-24 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Albritton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | House | Members intended to Cosponsor |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 477 |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 476 |
2017-04-11 | House | Ledbetter Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |