AL HB325 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sky lantern, possession or sale prohibited, Act 2017-387, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 13A-11-225 am'd.
Title
Sky lantern, possession or sale prohibited, Act 2017-387, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 13A-11-225 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Judiciary |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 568 |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |