AL HB324 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2014 Regular Session as contained in 2014 supplements and replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2014 Regular Session as contained in 2014 supplements and replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-368.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-03HouseEnrolled
2015-06-03HousePassed Second House
2015-06-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1397
2015-06-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-26SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2015-05-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 600
2015-05-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback