AL HB323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home Builders Licensure Board, executive director and deputy director, board required to obtain approval of Governor and the State Personnel Board when setting salary for, Sec. 34-14A-4 am'd.
Title
Home Builders Licensure Board, executive director and deputy director, board required to obtain approval of Governor and the State Personnel Board when setting salary for, Sec. 34-14A-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-179. |
2019-05-08 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 615 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 320 |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |