AL HB323 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Improvement districts, board of directors further provided for, procedure for assessment of lands within a district, clarified, temporary construction financing authorized, retroactive effect, Sec. 11-99A-52 added; Secs. 11-99A-9, 11-99A-11, 11-99A-13, 11-99A-17, 11-99A-21, 11-99A-30, 11-99A-42, 11-99A-43 am'd.
Title
Improvement districts, board of directors further provided for, procedure for assessment of lands within a district, clarified, temporary construction financing authorized, retroactive effect, Sec. 11-99A-52 added; Secs. 11-99A-9, 11-99A-11, 11-99A-13, 11-99A-17, 11-99A-21, 11-99A-30, 11-99A-42, 11-99A-43 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Williams motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Williams motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-373. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1094 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Williams motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 711 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1014 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 881 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 880 |
2013-04-25 | House | Hill Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 879 |
2013-04-25 | House | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |