AL HB322 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Montgomery County; to further provide for the salary of the members of the Montgomery County Commission.
Title
Relating to Montgomery County; to further provide for the salary of the members of the Montgomery County Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - Adopt YHWY6N-1 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - Adopt YHWY6N-1 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-24 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-11 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-11 | House | Adopt YHWY6N-1 |
2023-05-11 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-09 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported Favorably from House Montgomery County Legislation |
2023-05-09 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Montgomery County Legislation YHWY6N-1 |
2023-05-09 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Montgomery County Legislation AHDT77-1 |
2023-04-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Montgomery County Legislation |
2023-04-13 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |