AL HB322 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public schools, restrooms or changing areas, required to be used based on individual's biological sex, kindergarden to fifth grade classroom instruction, limited regarding sexual orientation or gender identity, St. Board of Education to adopt rules
Title
Public schools, restrooms or changing areas, required to be used based on individual's biological sex, kindergarden to fifth grade classroom instruction, limited regarding sexual orientation or gender identity, St. Board of Education to adopt rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Stadthagen motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 978 (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Kitchens motion to Previous Question Roll Call 977 (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Givan motion challenging Rule 25 interpretation (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1058 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 1057 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 285 (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - HBIR: Stadthagen motion to Adopt Roll Call 284 (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Kitchens motion to Previous Question Roll Call 977 (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Givan motion challenging Rule 25 interpretation (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1058 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 1057 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 285 (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - HBIR: Stadthagen motion to Adopt Roll Call 284 (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-290. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | House | Stadthagen motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 978 |
2022-04-07 | House | Givan motion challenging Rule 25 interpretation |
2022-04-07 | House | Kitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 977 |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Shelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1057 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 1056 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Shelnutt Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 285 |
2022-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |