AL HB322 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Delivered to Governor at 4;30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hospitals, private hospital assessment and Medicaid funding program extended for fiscal year 2019, Secs. 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals, private hospital assessment and Medicaid funding program extended for fiscal year 2019, Secs. 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseDelivered to Governor at 4;30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-543.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28HousePassed Second House
2018-03-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1214
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-27SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2018-02-13HouseBuskey intended to vote "Yea"
2018-02-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 322
2018-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback