AL HB322 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Finance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Finance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education Trust Fund, Rolling Reserve, to provide further for appropriation cap; ETF Budget Stabilization Fund authorizes further uses of revenues, including payments to the PACT Fund; to prohibit appropriations from holding or clearing accounts; Secs. 29-9-3, 29-9-4 am'd.
Title
Education Trust Fund, Rolling Reserve, to provide further for appropriation cap; ETF Budget Stabilization Fund authorizes further uses of revenues, including payments to the PACT Fund; to prohibit appropriations from holding or clearing accounts; Secs. 29-9-3, 29-9-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education with 1 amendment |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-21 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 959 |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 958 |
2015-05-21 | House | Poole Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 957 |
2015-05-21 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |