AL HB322 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, driving under the influence, penalties to include mandatory use of ignition interlock device under certain conditions, Forensic Sciences Department to approve devices, Public Safety Department to issue restricted driver's license, fee, provisions for indigent defendants, Sec. 32-5A-191.4 added; Sec. 32-5A-191 am'd. (2010-20173)
Title
Motor vehicles, driving under the influence, penalties to include mandatory use of ignition interlock device under certain conditions, Forensic Sciences Department to approve devices, Public Safety Department to issue restricted driver's license, fee, provisions for indigent defendants, Sec. 32-5A-191.4 added; Sec. 32-5A-191 am'd. (2010-20173)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 251 | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 250 | |
2010-02-11 | Page Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | McClendon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 241 | |
2010-02-11 | Public Safety first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-02-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety |