AL HB321 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 7:22 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 7:22 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Colleges and universities, participation in reciprocity agreements with other member states to generate without additional state approval or authorization in other member states, Secs. 10A-1-7.02, 16-46-3 am'd.
Title
Colleges and universities, participation in reciprocity agreements with other member states to generate without additional state approval or authorization in other member states, Secs. 10A-1-7.02, 16-46-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 7:22 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-330. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1077 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-05 | House | Payne and Hurst intended to vote "Yea" |
2014-03-05 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 589 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 588 |
2014-03-05 | House | Poole Amendment Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 587 |
2014-03-05 | House | Education Policy first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |