AL HB320 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assigned Act No. 2017-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calhoun Co., bingo for charitable purposes, licensees prohibited from operating in a residential area, Amendment 508 (Section 1, Local Amendments, Calhoun County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd, const. amend.
Title
Calhoun Co., bingo for charitable purposes, licensees prohibited from operating in a residential area, Amendment 508 (Section 1, Local Amendments, Calhoun County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Nordgren motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Nordgren motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-81. |
2017-03-16 | House | Forwarded to Secretary of State at 11:58 a.m. on March 16, 2017. |
2017-03-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-03-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 358 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-07 | House | Nordgren resolution of local application adopted Roll Call 155 |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 154 |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |