AL HB320 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:30 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:30 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence, greater protection to victims, provided, Sec. 13A-6-139.1, 41-23-150 added; Secs. 11-45-9, 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131, 13A-6-132, 13A-6-134, 13A-6-138, 13A-6-140 to 13A-6-143, inclusive, 15-10-3, 15-13-190, 15-23-68, 30-5-2, 30-5-3, 30-5-5 to 30-5-8, inclusive, 30-6-1 to 30-6-11, inclusive, 30-6-13, 30-7-1 to 30-7-6, inclusive, 30-9-1, 30-9-2, am'd.
Title
Domestic violence, greater protection to victims, provided, Sec. 13A-6-139.1, 41-23-150 added; Secs. 11-45-9, 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131, 13A-6-132, 13A-6-134, 13A-6-138, 13A-6-140 to 13A-6-143, inclusive, 15-10-3, 15-13-190, 15-23-68, 30-5-2, 30-5-3, 30-5-5 to 30-5-8, inclusive, 30-6-1 to 30-6-11, inclusive, 30-6-13, 30-7-1 to 30-7-6, inclusive, 30-9-1, 30-9-2, am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:30 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-493. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-04 | House | Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1275 |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1445 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Scofield motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Albritton Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1444 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Scofield Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1443 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Scofield motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Scofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-26 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1049 |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1048 |
2015-05-26 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |