AL HB32 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 3 municipality organized under Act 618, 1973 Reg. Sess., Montgomery Co., airport authority, two additional members appointed by county commission
Title
Class 3 municipality organized under Act 618, 1973 Reg. Sess., Montgomery Co., airport authority, two additional members appointed by county commission
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 66 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 276 |
2016-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |