AL HB318 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to municipalities; to add a new Article 3, commencing with Section 11-54B-80 to Title 11, Chapter 54B, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide that Class 3 municipalities may establish self-help business improvement districts.
Title
Relating to municipalities; to add a new Article 3, commencing with Section 11-54B-80 to Title 11, Chapter 54B, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide that Class 3 municipalities may establish self-help business improvement districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Whitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | House | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-04-27 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Favorably from House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-04-26 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Economic Development and Tourism 6LYP33-1 |
2023-04-26 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Economic Development and Tourism NF24JJ-1 |
2023-04-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-04-13 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |