AL HB318 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2015 First Special Session, 2015 Second Special Session, 2016 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2015 First Special Session, 2015 Second Special Session, 2016 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Gaston motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-442.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseGaston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1014
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1268
2017-05-17SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1267
2017-05-17SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2017-04-25HouseEngrossed
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 597
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 596
2017-04-25HouseState Government Amendment Offered
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-28HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB318&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB318-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183505-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570662&VOTE=596&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570663&VOTE=597&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578108&VOTE=1267&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578111&VOTE=1268&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578854&VOTE=1014&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback