AL HB317 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 11:57 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 11:57 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic Development, notification and confidentiality provisions revised for certain economic incentives, State Industrial Development Authority, bonds for industrial development and site preparation, auth., definition of lobbying under Ethics Act not to include economic development professionals under certain conditions, expiration date, Alabama Jobs Enhancement Act, Secs. 41-29-501 to 41-29-507, inclusive, added; Sec. 41-29-3 am'd.
Title
Economic Development, notification and confidentiality provisions revised for certain economic incentives, State Industrial Development Authority, bonds for industrial development and site preparation, auth., definition of lobbying under Ethics Act not to include economic development professionals under certain conditions, expiration date, Alabama Jobs Enhancement Act, Secs. 41-29-501 to 41-29-507, inclusive, added; Sec. 41-29-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 22 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:57 p.m. on March 28, 2018. |
2018-03-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-541. |
2018-03-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-29 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-29 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1104 |
2018-03-29 | House | Beech filed conflict of interest |
2018-03-29 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-28 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt pending |
2018-03-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1245 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1218 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Williams Substitute Offered |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Sanford motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1205 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Williams first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Williams motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development third Amendment Offered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Williams motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development second Amendment Offered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Williams motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-06 | House | Hanes intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 610 |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 609 |
2018-03-06 | House | Johnson (K) Amendment Offered |
2018-03-06 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 608 |
2018-03-06 | House | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |