AL HB316 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 6:18 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 6:18 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex Offenders, registration and community notification, technical revisions and citations update various sections, petition for relief from employment, residency living restriction, civil division of circuit courts, absconding without registering, penalty, Secs. 12-15-107, 12-15-116, 13A-5-2, 13A-5-6, 14-9-41, 15-18-8, 15-19-7, 15-20A-4 to 15-20A-9, incl., 15-20A-11, 15-20A-12, 15-20A-14, 15-20A-15, 15-20A-16, 15-20A-18, 15-20A-21 to 15-20A-29, incl., 15-20A-32, 15-20A-34, 15-20A-35, 15-20A-37, 15-20A-38, 15-20A-39, 15-20A-40, 15-20A-42, 15-20A-43, 15-20A-44, 15-20A-45, 15-20A-46, 15-22-27.3, 32-6-49.24, 36-18-24, 36-18-25, 38-13-2, 38-13-4 am'd.
Title
Sex Offenders, registration and community notification, technical revisions and citations update various sections, petition for relief from employment, residency living restriction, civil division of circuit courts, absconding without registering, penalty, Secs. 12-15-107, 12-15-116, 13A-5-2, 13A-5-6, 14-9-41, 15-18-8, 15-19-7, 15-20A-4 to 15-20A-9, incl., 15-20A-11, 15-20A-12, 15-20A-14, 15-20A-15, 15-20A-16, 15-20A-18, 15-20A-21 to 15-20A-29, incl., 15-20A-32, 15-20A-34, 15-20A-35, 15-20A-37, 15-20A-38, 15-20A-39, 15-20A-40, 15-20A-42, 15-20A-43, 15-20A-44, 15-20A-45, 15-20A-46, 15-22-27.3, 32-6-49.24, 36-18-24, 36-18-25, 38-13-2, 38-13-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Givan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Givan motion to Table (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Givan motion to Table (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:18 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Engrossed |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-463. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-04 | House | Givan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1297 |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1456 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1455 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1454 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-12 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 687 |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 686 |
2015-05-12 | House | Jones Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 685 |
2015-05-12 | House | JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Givan motion to Table adopted Roll Call 684 |
2015-05-12 | House | JUDY 1st Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 683 |
2015-05-12 | House | JUDY 3rd Amendment Offered |
2015-05-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |