AL HB315 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of registrars, number of days a registrar may annually work, further provided, Sec. 17-3-8.1 added
Title
Board of registrars, number of days a registrar may annually work, further provided, Sec. 17-3-8.1 added
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Fincher [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 688 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Fincher motion to Adopt Roll Call 687 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Fincher motion to Adopt Roll Call 687 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Holley Amendment Offered |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 688 |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |