AL HB315 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-383.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-383.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Midwifery Board, established to license and regulate the practice of midwifery, penalty for unlawful practice, Secs. 34-19-2 to 34-19-10 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-7, 34-19-3, 34-19-11 to 34-19-20, inclusive, 34-43-3 am'd.
Title
Midwifery Board, established to license and regulate the practice of midwifery, penalty for unlawful practice, Secs. 34-19-2 to 34-19-10 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-7, 34-19-3, 34-19-11 to 34-19-20, inclusive, 34-43-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Williams motion to Table (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Members intended to cosponsor (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 76) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 20 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Williams motion to Table (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Members intended to cosponsor (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 76) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 20 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-383. |
2017-05-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:04 p.m. on May 19, 2017. |
2017-05-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-05-19 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1041 |
2017-05-19 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1325 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1324 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Bussman Amendment Offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Orr motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1293 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1292 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1291 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1290 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Williams motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1289 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-25 | House | Members intended to cosponsor |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 602 |
2017-04-25 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 601 |
2017-04-25 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 600 |
2017-04-25 | House | Beech Amendment Offered |
2017-04-25 | House | Mooney Amendment Offered |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 599 |
2017-04-25 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |