AL HB314 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, make abortion a Class A felony and attempted abortion a Class C felony

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, make abortion a Class A felony and attempted abortion a Class C felony

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Reconsider and Table (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 5 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Rogers motion to Carry Over to Day Certain (Y: 3 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateJudiciary first Amendment Offered
2019-05-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 15, 2019.
2019-05-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-189.
2019-05-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-15SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-14HouseEnrolled
2019-05-14HousePassed Second House
2019-05-14SenateChambliss motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Roll Call 720
2019-05-14SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 719
2019-05-14SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 718
2019-05-14SenateSingleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 717
2019-05-14SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2019-05-14SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 716
2019-05-14SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2019-05-14SenateColeman-Madison motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 715
2019-05-14SenateColeman-Madison Amendment Offered
2019-05-14SenateFigures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 714
2019-05-14SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2019-05-14SenateFigures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 713
2019-05-14SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2019-05-14SenateFigures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 712
2019-05-14SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2019-05-14SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-09SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-09SenateChambliss motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-09SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2019-05-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-04-30HouseSells intended to vote "Yea"
2019-04-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 425
2019-04-30HouseRogers motion to Carry Over to Day Certain lost Roll Call 424
2019-04-30HouseScott intended to vote "Nay"
2019-04-30HouseCollins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 423
2019-04-30HouseColeman Amendment Offered
2019-04-30HouseCollins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 422
2019-04-30HouseDaniels Amendment Offered
2019-04-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-03HouseRereferred from Judy to Health
2019-04-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB314&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB314-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB314-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200209-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200202-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200834-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201012-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201031-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201010-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201024-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201268-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201132-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613980&VOTE=422&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613999&VOTE=423&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614120&VOTE=424&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614121&VOTE=425&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618462&VOTE=712&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618464&VOTE=713&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618466&VOTE=714&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618537&VOTE=715&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618539&VOTE=716&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618541&VOTE=717&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618577&VOTE=718&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618579&VOTE=719&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=618582&VOTE=720&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback