AL HB314 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Forwarded to Secretary of State at 2:48 p. m. on April 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Forwarded to Secretary of State at 2:48 p. m. on April 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cullman Co., legislative authority to transfer sixteenth section lands and income to county board of education, const. amend.
Title
Cullman Co., legislative authority to transfer sixteenth section lands and income to county board of education, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Buttram [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Jeremy Oden [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Forwarded to Secretary of State at 2:48 p. m. on April 3, 2012. | |
2012-04-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-174. | |
2012-04-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 89 | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |