AL HB313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic Examiners, Board of, authorized to acquire, convey, and hold real property, Sec. 34-24-143 am'd.
Title
Chiropractic Examiners, Board of, authorized to acquire, convey, and hold real property, Sec. 34-24-143 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 515 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 514 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 470 (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 469 (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SBIR: Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 514 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 470 (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 469 (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022. |
2022-03-10 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-156. |
2022-03-10 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 515 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 470 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |