AL HB313 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 6:08 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 6:08 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prattville, corp. limits alt. to deannex certain property
Title
Prattville, corp. limits alt. to deannex certain property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to adopt BIR (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to adopt BIR (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 6:08 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-515. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1442 | |
2012-05-16 | Brewbaker motion to adopt BIR adopted Roll Call 1441 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading | |
2012-05-09 | Taylor Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 81 | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |