AL HB310 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to building codes; to create the Healthier Homes Construction Practices Act; to authorize counties and municipalities to adopt procedures for the installation and activation of temporary-permanent electricity or temporary-permanent gas under certain conditions; and to provide certain requirements for the activation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to building codes; to create the Healthier Homes Construction Practices Act; to authorize counties and municipalities to adopt procedures for the installation and activation of temporary-permanent electricity or temporary-permanent gas under certain conditions; and to provide certain requirements for the activation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-03 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Adopt VQU8PP-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HouseEnacted
2023-05-04HouseEnrolled
2023-05-04SenateReady to Enroll
2023-05-03SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-03SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-02SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-02SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-02SenateReported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government
2023-04-27SenateReferred to Committee to Senate County and Municipal Government
2023-04-27HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-04-25HouseRead a Third Time and Pass as Amended
2023-04-25HouseAdopt VQU8PP-1
2023-04-25HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-19HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-19HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-19HouseReported Favorably from House County and Municipal Government
2023-04-19HouseAmendment/Substitute by House County and Municipal Government VQU8PP-1
2023-04-19HouseAmendment/Substitute by House County and Municipal Government Z2XCWR-1
2023-04-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to House County and Municipal Government
2023-04-13HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB310-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB310-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/VQU8PP-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/Z2XCWR-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-Q3MX54-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-Q3MX54-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-Q3MX54-3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc420
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc421
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc570

Bill Comments

feedback