AL HB310 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forestry Commission, rules concerning state forests and other land it controls, criminal penalties for violations; Sec. 9-13-10.2 added
Title
Forestry Commission, rules concerning state forests and other land it controls, criminal penalties for violations; Sec. 9-13-10.2 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-462. |
2018-03-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1003 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 262 |
2018-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |