AL HB31 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Juveniles, dependency hearing, allow statements to be entered into evidence in cases if they were made by a child under the age of 12 during a forensic interview and pertain to allegations of abuse against the child, Secs. 12-15-301, 12-15-310 am'd.
Title
Juveniles, dependency hearing, allow statements to be entered into evidence in cases if they were made by a child under the age of 12 during a forensic interview and pertain to allegations of abuse against the child, Secs. 12-15-301, 12-15-310 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-381. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1363 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 74 |
2019-04-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 73 |
2019-04-02 | House | Collins Amendment Offered |
2019-04-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 72 |
2019-04-02 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |