AL HB31 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

County Superintendent of Education, prohibition against additional employment removed, Sec. 16-9-12 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Superintendent of Education, prohibition against additional employment removed, Sec. 16-9-12 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 22, 2018.
2018-03-22HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-410.
2018-03-22HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-22SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-21HouseEnrolled
2018-03-21HousePassed Second House
2018-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 935
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-22SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
2018-02-20HouseEngrossed
2018-02-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 405
2018-02-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 404
2018-02-20HouseHill Amendment Offered
2018-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback