AL HB31 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:31 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., municipal mayor, council member, judge and prosecution, may participate in the Employees' Retirement System, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., municipal mayor, council member, judge and prosecution, may participate in the Employees' Retirement System, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 9:31 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-338.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-03HouseEnrolled
2015-06-03HousePassed Second House
2015-06-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1344
2015-06-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-06-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-03-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 93
2015-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-03-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback