AL HB31 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health care providers authorized to decline to perform services that violate their consciences, exceptions, Health Care Rights of Conscience Act
Title
Health care providers authorized to decline to perform services that violate their consciences, exceptions, Health Care Rights of Conscience Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-21 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Health |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-21 | House | Engrossed |
2014-01-21 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2014-01-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 43 |
2014-01-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 42 |
2014-01-21 | House | Health first Substitute Offered |
2014-01-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |