AL HB31 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisoners, escaped inmates, notification of state and local agencies and news media, liability limited, Joel Willmore Act, Sec. 14-3-58 am'd.
Title
Prisoners, escaped inmates, notification of state and local agencies and news media, liability limited, Joel Willmore Act, Sec. 14-3-58 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 93 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 92 | |
2012-02-23 | Colston Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 91 | |
2012-02-23 | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |