AL HB306 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Attorneys, encouraging litigation, criminal penalties increased, Secs. 34-3-24, 34-3-35 am'd.
Title
Attorneys, encouraging litigation, criminal penalties increased, Secs. 34-3-24, 34-3-35 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Fridy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 35 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 35 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |