AL HB305 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Delivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Human trafficking, further provided, prostitution with a minor, certain defenses prohibited, licensing by Massage Therapy Bd. further provided for, Secs. 13A-6-157.1, 13A-6-161, 13A-6-162, 13A-12-121.1, 13A-12-124, 13A-12-125 added; Secs. 13A-6-151, 13A-6-152, 13A-6-157, 13A-6-158, 13A-12-122, 15-27-1, 15-27-2, 34-43-12 to 34-43-15, inclusive, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking, further provided, prostitution with a minor, certain defenses prohibited, licensing by Massage Therapy Bd. further provided for, Secs. 13A-6-157.1, 13A-6-161, 13A-6-162, 13A-12-121.1, 13A-12-124, 13A-12-125 added; Secs. 13A-6-151, 13A-6-152, 13A-6-157, 13A-6-158, 13A-12-122, 15-27-1, 15-27-2, 34-43-12 to 34-43-15, inclusive, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Williams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-506.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28HouseWilliams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1088
2018-03-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1186
2018-03-27SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1185
2018-03-27SenateWard Amendment Offered
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-27SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-22SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1074
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-22SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments
2018-03-13HouseTuggle intended to vote "Yea"
2018-03-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed
2018-03-13HouseCosponsors Added
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 737
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 736
2018-03-13HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB305&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB305-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB305-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB305-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192284-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193665-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193768-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193770-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/194030-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595194&VOTE=736&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595197&VOTE=737&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595198&VOTE=738&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600282&VOTE=1074&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601536&VOTE=1185&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601539&VOTE=1186&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602231&VOTE=1088&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback