AL HB305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, traffic accident reports, confidentiality, exceptions, Sec. 32-10-7 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, traffic accident reports, confidentiality, exceptions, Sec. 32-10-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Fridy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-06 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 445 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 444 |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |