AL HB303 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, manufacturers, prohibition on selling alcohol on Sundays, not applicable to certain tastings and samplings on licensed premises, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, manufacturers, prohibition on selling alcohol on Sundays, not applicable to certain tastings and samplings on licensed premises, Sec. 28-3A-25 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-513. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1201 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 663 |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 662 |
2018-03-08 | House | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |