AL HB303 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Title Insurance, agents, attorneys exempt from licenses by Insurance Department, Sec. 27-25-3 am'd.
Title
Title Insurance, agents, attorneys exempt from licenses by Insurance Department, Sec. 27-25-3 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-02 | House | Rereferred from Insurance to Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |