AL HB302 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation and Natural Resources Department, commercial bird hunting preserve license, alternate license provided where regular hunting license not required, fees, requirements, Secs. 9-11-410, 9-11-412, 9-11-413, 9-11-414, 9-11-417 am'd.; Secs. 9-11-411, 9-11-415, 9-11-416 repealed
Title
Conservation and Natural Resources Department, commercial bird hunting preserve license, alternate license provided where regular hunting license not required, fees, requirements, Secs. 9-11-410, 9-11-412, 9-11-413, 9-11-414, 9-11-417 am'd.; Secs. 9-11-411, 9-11-415, 9-11-416 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-697 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1208 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160 | |
2010-01-28 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |