AL HB300 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use tax, durable medical equipment, prosthetics and orthotics, and certain medical supplies, exempt when covered and paid by third party
Title
Sales and use tax, durable medical equipment, prosthetics and orthotics, and certain medical supplies, exempt when covered and paid by third party
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Singleton motion to recommit (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Singleton motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 838 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Singleton motion to recommit |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 968 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 967 |
2013-04-25 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment #2 Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 966 |
2013-04-25 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment #1 Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-02-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |