AL HB30 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture and Industries Dept. seeds, regulation reserved to dept., local regulation prohibited, Sec. 2-26-3.1 added
Title
Agriculture and Industries Dept. seeds, regulation reserved to dept., local regulation prohibited, Sec. 2-26-3.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2016-02-17 | House | Engrossed |
2016-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 42 |
2016-02-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 41 |
2016-02-17 | House | Sessions Amendment Offered |
2016-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |